IA HF2104 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-06 - Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement. Vote Total: 3-0.
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-06 - Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement. Vote Total: 3-0.
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to restrictions on the acquisition of real property by the department of natural resources.
Title
A bill for an act relating to restrictions on the acquisition of real property by the department of natural resources.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement. Vote Total: 3-0. |
2024-01-30 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/01/2024 1:30 PM or upon adjournment of Enviro Prot RM 102, Sup. Ct. Consult. |
2024-01-30 | House | Subcommittee: Mommsen, Scholten and Sherman. H.J. 159. |
2024-01-23 | House | Introduced, referred to Natural Resources. H.J. 118. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3129 (Related) 2024-02-13 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2324.
SF2324 (Similar To) 2024-03-12 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1.
SF2324 (Similar To) 2024-03-12 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HF2104 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HF2104.html |