IA HF21 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-31 - END OF [] ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-31 - END OF [] ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to revitalization areas by authorizing cities and counties to provide property tax exemptions for certain property located in areas previously subjected to lending discrimination and including applicability provisions.(See HF 626.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to revitalization areas by authorizing cities and counties to provide property tax exemptions for certain property located in areas previously subjected to lending discrimination and including applicability provisions.(See HF 626.)
Sponsors
Rep. Dustin Hite [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-31 | House | END OF [] ACTIONS |
2021-03-08 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 645. |
2021-02-22 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 626. |
2021-02-17 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 470. |
2021-02-09 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2021-02-08 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: []. |
2021-01-19 | House | Subcommittee: Hite, Isenhart and Mitchell. H.J. 118. |
2021-01-13 | House | Rereferred to Ways and Means. H.J. 83. |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced, referred to Local Government. H.J. 52. |
Same As/Similar To
HF626 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Amendment S-5073 filed. S.J. 563.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF21 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF21.html |