IA HF209 | 2011-2012 | 84th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-10 - Subcommittee reassigned, Baudler, Kressig, and Tjepkes. H.J. 53.
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-10 - Subcommittee reassigned, Baudler, Kressig, and Tjepkes. H.J. 53.
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to physical defense training and firearms training including the creation of a domestic abuse assault fund, and providing for a sales tax refund and a fee.
Title
A bill for an act relating to physical defense training and firearms training including the creation of a domestic abuse assault fund, and providing for a sales tax refund and a fee.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-10 | Subcommittee reassigned, Baudler, Kressig, and Tjepkes. H.J. 53. | |
2011-12-31 | END OF 2011 ACTIONS | |
2011-02-11 | Subcommittee, Shaw, Brandenburg, and Wolfe. H.J. 318. | |
2011-02-04 | Introduced, referred to Public Safety. H.J. 281. |