IA HF2060 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - Subcommittee Meeting: 01/28/2020 3:00PM House Lounge.
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-27 - Subcommittee Meeting: 01/28/2020 3:00PM House Lounge.
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the date for an election to authorize the issuance of certain indebtedness by school districts.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the date for an election to authorize the issuance of certain indebtedness by school districts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-27 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/28/2020 3:00PM House Lounge. |
2020-01-22 | House | Subcommittee: Sexton, Donahue and Mitchell. H.J. 124. |
2020-01-21 | House | Introduced, referred to State Government. H.J. 105. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF2060 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF2060.html |