IA HF2019 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-12 - Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-12 - Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act establishing a conditional exception to pre-use inspection requirements for new school buses.
Title
A bill for an act establishing a conditional exception to pre-use inspection requirements for new school buses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-12 | House | Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement. |
2020-01-28 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/28/2020 9:30AM House Lounge. |
2020-01-22 | House | Subcommittee: Sieck, Landon and Meyer, B.. H.J. 123. |
2020-01-15 | House | Introduced, referred to Transportation. H.J. 78. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF2019 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF2019.html |