IA HF2017 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-11 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-11 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act creating an advanced registered nurse practitioner preceptor tax credit available against the individual income tax, and including applicability provisions.
Title
A bill for an act creating an advanced registered nurse practitioner preceptor tax credit available against the individual income tax, and including applicability provisions.
Sponsors
Rep. Ann Meyer [R] | Rep. Jacob Bossman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-11 | House | Fiscal note. |
2024-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. |
2024-01-31 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/06/2024 12:00PM House Lounge. |
2024-01-24 | House | Subcommittee: Siegrist, Best and Jacoby. H.J. 131. |
2024-01-09 | House | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 31. |