IA HF2009 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-25 - Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement. Vote Total: 3-0
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-25 - Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement. Vote Total: 3-0
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act authorizing the use of revenues from the district management levy for the employment of school resource officers and including applicability provisions.
Title
A bill for an act authorizing the use of revenues from the district management levy for the employment of school resource officers and including applicability provisions.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Lohse [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement. Vote Total: 3-0 |
2022-01-24 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/25/2022 12:00PM RM 103, Sup. Ct. Chamber. |
2022-01-12 | House | Subcommittee: Wheeler, Mascher and Salmon. H.J. 67. |
2022-01-11 | House | Introduced, referred to Education. H.J. 30. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF2009 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF2009.html |