IA HF2009 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-23 - Subcommittee Meeting: 01/28/2020 8:30AM House Lounge.
Pending: House Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-23 - Subcommittee Meeting: 01/28/2020 8:30AM House Lounge.
Pending: House Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to reimbursement for services provided in an emergency department to Medicaid members.
Title
A bill for an act relating to reimbursement for services provided in an emergency department to Medicaid members.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-23 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/28/2020 8:30AM House Lounge. |
2020-01-22 | House | Subcommittee: Fry, Best and Brown-Powers. H.J. 123. |
2020-01-15 | House | Introduced, referred to Human Resources. H.J. 67. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HF2009 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HF2009.html |