IA HF2006 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - Withdrawn. H.J. 512.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-07 - Withdrawn. H.J. 512.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing for brain injury policies for certain extracurricular interscholastic activities, and including applicability provisions. (See HF 2442.)
Title
A bill for an act providing for brain injury policies for certain extracurricular interscholastic activities, and including applicability provisions. (See HF 2442.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-07 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 512. |
2018-02-12 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2018-01-25 | House | Subcommittee reassigned: Hager, Brown-Powers and Wheeler. H.J. 154. |
2018-01-23 | House | Subcommittee: Jones, Brown-Powers and Wheeler. H.J. 141. |
2018-01-10 | House | Introduced, referred to Education. H.J. 70. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2442 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 882.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HF2006 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/HouseFiles/Introduced/HF2006.html |