IA HF2004 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2328.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2328.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to confidential records and juror questionnaires.(See HF 2328.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to confidential records and juror questionnaires.(See HF 2328.)
Sponsors
Rep. Dustin Hite [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-08 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2328. |
2022-02-08 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 201. |
2022-01-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0 |
2022-01-19 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/20/2022 11:00AM RM 19. |
2022-01-11 | House | Subcommittee: Hite, Wheeler and Wolfe. H.J. 50. |
2022-01-11 | House | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 29. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2328 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 219.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF2004 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF2004.html |