IA HF2 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-01 - NOBA: Graybook
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-01 - NOBA: Graybook
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the unauthorized placement of a global positioning device and providing a penalty. (See HF 204.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the unauthorized placement of a global positioning device and providing a penalty. (See HF 204.)
Sponsors
Rep. Ken Rizer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-01 | House | NOBA: Graybook |
2018-06-01 | House | NOBA: Graybook |
2018-06-01 | House | NOBA: Graybook |
2018-06-01 | House | NOBA: Graybook |
2018-06-01 | House | NOBA: Graybook |
2018-06-01 | House | NOBA: Graybook |
2018-05-05 | House | NOBA: Final |
2018-05-05 | House | NOBA: House Floor |
2018-05-04 | House | NOBA: Final |
2018-05-04 | House | NOBA: Final |
2018-05-03 | House | NOBA: Final |
2018-05-03 | House | NOBA: House Full Approps |
2018-05-03 | House | NOBA: Senate Full Approps |
2018-05-03 | House | NOBA: Senate Floor |
2018-05-03 | House | NOBA: Senate Floor |
2018-05-02 | House | NOBA: Senate Floor |
2018-05-01 | House | NOBA: Senate Floor |
2018-05-01 | House | NOBA: Senate Floor |
2018-05-01 | House | NOBA: Final |
2018-05-01 | House | NOBA: Final |
2018-05-01 | House | NOBA: House Full Approps |
2018-04-30 | House | NOBA: House Floor |
2018-04-30 | House | NOBA: House Floor |
2018-04-30 | House | NOBA: House Full Approps |
2018-04-30 | House | NOBA: House Full Approps |
2018-04-26 | House | NOBA: House Floor |
2018-04-26 | House | NOBA: House Floor |
2018-04-26 | House | NOBA: House Floor |
2018-04-24 | House | NOBA: House Floor |
2018-04-18 | House | NOBA: House Full Approps |
2018-04-18 | House | NOBA: House Full Approps |
2018-04-18 | House | NOBA: House Full Approps |
2018-04-18 | House | NOBA: House Full Approps |
2018-04-18 | House | NOBA: House Full Approps |
2018-04-13 | House | NOBA: House Full Approps |
2018-04-05 | House | NOBA: House Full Approps |
2018-04-03 | House | NOBA: House Full Approps |
2017-02-02 | House | Fiscal note. |
2017-02-01 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 179. |
2017-01-19 | House | Subcommittee: Kerr, Klein and Kressig. H.J. 101. |
2017-01-17 | House | Introduced, referred to Public Safety. H.J. 83. |
Same As/Similar To
HF204 (Similar To) 2017-04-04 - Referred to Public Safety. H.J. 869.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HF2 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/HouseFiles/Introduced/HF2.html |