IA HF197 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-01 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-01 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act concerning the contract bidding process for public improvement projects conducted by the state board of regents.
Title
A bill for an act concerning the contract bidding process for public improvement projects conducted by the state board of regents.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2017-02-14 | House | Subcommittee: Pettengill, T. Taylor and Watts. H.J. 305. |
2017-02-01 | House | Introduced, referred to State Government. H.J. 174. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB100 (Related) 2017-02-21 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/23/2017 11:00AM House Lounge (Cancelled)
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HF197 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/HouseFiles/Introduced/HF197.html |