IA HF133 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-10 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 2-0
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-10 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 2-0
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the extension of deadlines for the completion of continuing education requirements.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the extension of deadlines for the completion of continuing education requirements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-10 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 2-0 |
2021-01-26 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/28/2021 7:30AM RM 19. |
2021-01-21 | House | Subcommittee reassigned: Bacon, Gjerde and Lundgren. H.J. 175. |
2021-01-21 | House | Subcommittee: Mascher, Gjerde and Lundgren. H.J. 175. |
2021-01-21 | House | Introduced, referred to State Government. H.J. 134. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF133 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF133.html |