IA HF133 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-12 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1007.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to guardians ad litem, attorneys for minor children, child custody investigators, and child and family reporters involved in child custody and visitation proceedings. (Formerly HSB 5.) Effective 7-1-17.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to guardians ad litem, attorneys for minor children, child custody investigators, and child and family reporters involved in child custody and visitation proceedings. (Formerly HSB 5.) Effective 7-1-17.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-03 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-12HouseSigned by Governor. H.J. 1007.
2017-04-11HouseSent to Governor. H.J. 981.
2017-04-11HouseReported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 981.
2017-04-03HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 828.
2017-04-03SenateImmediate message. S.J. 852.
2017-04-03SenatePassed Senate, ayes 49, nays 0. S.J. 852.
2017-04-03SenateAmendment S-3274 filed, withdrawn. S.J. 851.
2017-04-03SenateDeferred. S.J. 844.
2017-03-14SenateCommittee report, recommending passage. S.J. 606.
2017-02-20SenateSubcommittee: Schneider, Dawson, and Petersen. S.J. 360.
2017-02-14SenateRead first time, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 277.
2017-02-14SenateMessage from House. S.J. 277.
2017-02-14HouseImmediate message. H.J. 301.
2017-02-14HousePassed House, ayes 98, nays 0. H.J. 293.
2017-01-30HouseIntroduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 137.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback