IA HF130 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-22 - Withdrawn. H.J. 451.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-22 - Withdrawn. H.J. 451.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act concerning the release of certain military personnel records. (See HF 308.)
Title
A bill for an act concerning the release of certain military personnel records. (See HF 308.)
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Ourth [D] | Rep. Steven Holt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-22 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 451. |
2017-02-10 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 267. |
2017-01-31 | House | Subcommittee: Sheets, Deyoe and Nielsen. H.J. 167. |
2017-01-26 | House | Introduced, referred to Local Government. H.J. 129. |
Same As/Similar To
HF308 (Similar To) 2017-04-21 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1142.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HF130 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/HouseFiles/Introduced/HF130.html |