IA HF123 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Subcommittee: Vander Linden, McConkey and Windschitl. H.J. 244.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Subcommittee: Vander Linden, McConkey and Windschitl. H.J. 244.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act creating a geothermal tax credit available against the franchise tax and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions.
Title
A bill for an act creating a geothermal tax credit available against the franchise tax and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-07 | House | Subcommittee: Vander Linden, McConkey and Windschitl. H.J. 244. |
2017-01-26 | House | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 128. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1120 (Related) 2017-02-20 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/21/2017 1:30PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge
SF387 (Similar To) 2017-03-07 - Fiscal note.
SF387 (Similar To) 2017-03-07 - Fiscal note.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HF123 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/HouseFiles/Introduced/HF123.html |