IA HF12 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 31-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-26 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 132.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-01-26 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 132.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to social studies instruction in public schools, accredited nonpublic schools, and charter schools.(See HF 132.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to social studies instruction in public schools, accredited nonpublic schools, and charter schools.(See HF 132.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-26 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 132. |
2023-01-24 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 190. |
2023-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1. |
2023-01-17 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/18/2023 3:00PM RM 304. |
2023-01-12 | House | Subcommittee: Holt, Buck and Hora. H.J. 96. |
2023-01-11 | House | Introduced, referred to Education. H.J. 59. |
Same As/Similar To
HF132 (Similar To) 2023-01-26 - Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 194.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HF12 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HF12.html |