IA HF110 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-31 - END OF 2013 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-31 - END OF 2013 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to taxation by updating the Code references to the Internal Revenue Code and decoupling from certain federal bonus depreciation provisions, providing certain taxpayers additional time to file a claim for refund or credit of individual income tax, extending the property assessment appeal board, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 38)
Title
A bill for an act relating to taxation by updating the Code references to the Internal Revenue Code and decoupling from certain federal bonus depreciation provisions, providing certain taxpayers additional time to file a claim for refund or credit of individual income tax, extending the property assessment appeal board, and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly HSB 38)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-31 | House | END OF 2013 ACTIONS |
2013-02-06 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 177. |
2013-02-06 | House | Substituted SF 106. H.J. 175. |
2013-02-06 | House | Amendment H-1001 adopted. H.J. 175. |
2013-02-05 | House | Fiscal note. HCS. |
2013-02-04 | House | Amendment H-1001 filed. H.J. 168. |
2013-01-30 | House | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 138. |