IA HF11 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 28-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-07 - Withdrawn. H.J. 539.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-07 - Withdrawn. H.J. 539.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the responsibilities of the state board of regents and the institutions of higher education governed by the state board of regents, including requiring the board to publish certain information related to the average income and student debt of institution graduates and requiring the institutions to provide career services to undergraduates.(See HF 135.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the responsibilities of the state board of regents and the institutions of higher education governed by the state board of regents, including requiring the board to publish certain information related to the average income and student debt of institution graduates and requiring the institutions to provide career services to undergraduates.(See HF 135.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-07 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 539. |
2023-01-26 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 135. |
2023-01-24 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 190. |
2023-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1. |
2023-01-17 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/18/2023 12:30PM House Lounge. |
2023-01-12 | House | Subcommittee: Holt, Bradley and Matson. H.J. 95. |
2023-01-11 | House | Introduced, referred to Education. H.J. 59. |
Same As/Similar To
HF135 (Similar To) 2023-03-29 - Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 714.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HF11 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HF11.html |