IA HF10 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-08 - Withdrawn. H.J. 559.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-08 - Withdrawn. H.J. 559.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to education, including requirements related to mandatory reporters, a process for investigating complaints against licensed practitioners, and the responsibilities of the department of education, school districts, charter schools, accredited nonpublic schools, and the board of educational examiners.(See HF 430.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to education, including requirements related to mandatory reporters, a process for investigating complaints against licensed practitioners, and the responsibilities of the department of education, school districts, charter schools, accredited nonpublic schools, and the board of educational examiners.(See HF 430.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-08 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 559. |
2023-02-24 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 430. |
2023-02-21 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 414. |
2023-01-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 3-0. |
2023-01-12 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/17/2023 12:00PM RM 304. |
2023-01-12 | House | Subcommittee: Boden, Gustoff and Staed. H.J. 95. |
2023-01-11 | House | Introduced, referred to Education. H.J. 59. |
Same As/Similar To
HF430 (Similar To) 2023-03-29 - Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 715.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HF10 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HF10.html |