IA HF1 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 54-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-15 - NOBA: House Full Approps
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-15 - NOBA: House Full Approps
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act establishing an organized system of reviews and ongoing repeal dates for programs and projects administered by executive branch departments.
Title
A bill for an act establishing an organized system of reviews and ongoing repeal dates for programs and projects administered by executive branch departments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-15 | House | NOBA: House Full Approps |
2017-01-25 | House | NOBA: House Full Approps |
2017-01-25 | House | Subcommittee: Koester, Bergan and Cohoon. H.J. 122. |
2017-01-19 | House | Sponsor added, Fry. H.J. 99. |
2017-01-17 | House | Introduced, referred to State Government. H.J. 83. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HF1 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/HouseFiles/Introduced/HF1.html |