IA HCR6 | 2011-2012 | 84th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-31 - END OF 2011 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-31 - END OF 2011 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A concurrent resolution to provide for a joint convention of the two houses of the 2011 session of the Eighty-fourth General Assembly to be held on Wednesday, February 16, 2011, at 10:00 a.m. for Brigadier General Timothy Orr to deliver his message of the Condition of the Iowa National Guard.
Title
A concurrent resolution to provide for a joint convention of the two houses of the 2011 session of the Eighty-fourth General Assembly to be held on Wednesday, February 16, 2011, at 10:00 a.m. for Brigadier General Timothy Orr to deliver his message of the Condition of the Iowa National Guard.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-31 | END OF 2011 ACTIONS | |
2011-01-27 | Message from Senate. H.J. 172. | |
2011-01-27 | Immediate message. S.J. 167. | |
2011-01-27 | Resolution adopted. S.J. 167. | |
2011-01-24 | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 135. | |
2011-01-18 | Read first time, referred to Rules & Administration. S.J. 87. | |
2011-01-18 | Message from House. S.J. 87. | |
2011-01-13 | Immediate message. H.J. 82. | |
2011-01-13 | Resolution adopted. H.J. 82. | |
2011-01-13 | Asked and received unanimous consent for the immediate consideration. H.J. 82. | |
2011-01-13 | Resolution filed. H.J. 82. |