HI SR157 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR157
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The State And City And County Of Honolulu To Clean And Maintain The Section Of North Road Between Hanakahi Street And Iroquois Road.
Title
Requesting The State And City And County Of Honolulu To Clean And Maintain The Section Of North Road Between Hanakahi Street And Iroquois Road.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1546), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, K. Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman, L. Thielen. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-19 2:25PM in conference room 224. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Referred to AEN, WAM. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR157 (Carry Over) 2019-03-27 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SR&billnumber=157&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SR157_.HTM |