HI SR100 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requesting Congress To Convene A Limited National Convention Under Article V Of The United States Constitution For The Exclusive Purpose Of Proposing An Amendment To The United States Constitution That Will Limit The Influence Of Money In The Electoral Process.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requesting Congress To Convene A Limited National Convention Under Article V Of The United States Constitution For The Exclusive Purpose Of Proposing An Amendment To The United States Constitution That Will Limit The Influence Of Money In The Electoral Process.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19SenateThe committee on JDC deferred the measure.
2019-03-15SenateThe committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-19 9:00AM in conference room 016.
2019-03-12SenateReferred to JDC.
2019-03-08SenateOffered.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback