HI SCR59 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SCR59

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urging The Funding Of The Maintenance And Expansion Of Prekindergarten In All Public Schools To Allow Access To All Children Of Hawaii, Especially Native Hawaiians, In Both Official Language Pathways.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging The Funding Of The Maintenance And Expansion Of Prekindergarten In All Public Schools To Allow Access To All Children Of Hawaii, Especially Native Hawaiians, In Both Official Language Pathways.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16SenateThe hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
2020-03-13SenateThe committee(s) on HWN/EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-20 2:50PM in conference room 229.
2020-03-05SenateReferred to HWN/EDU, WAM.
2020-03-03SenateOffered.

Same As/Similar To

SCR59 (Carry Over) 2019-03-11 - Referred to TRS/PSM, WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback