HI SCR20 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR20
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-12 - The committees on TIA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Onishi, Holt, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Creagan, DeCoite, Perruso, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-12 - The committees on TIA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Onishi, Holt, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Creagan, DeCoite, Perruso, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Agriculture And Hawaii Tourism Authority To Report To The Legislature On The Processing Of State Of Hawaii Plant And Animal Declaration Forms, Including The Costs Involved, And Convene A Task Force To Review The Efficacy Of Such Forms.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Agriculture And Hawaii Tourism Authority To Report To The Legislature On The Processing Of State Of Hawaii Plant And Animal Declaration Forms, Including The Costs Involved, And Convene A Task Force To Review The Efficacy Of Such Forms.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-12 | House | The committees on TIA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Onishi, Holt, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Creagan, DeCoite, Perruso, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2019-04-12 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Holt, Onishi, Perruso, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2019-04-09 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by AGR/TIA on Friday, 04-12-19 9:50AM in conference room 312. |
2019-04-05 | House | Referred to AGR/TIA, FIN, referral sheet 50 |
2019-04-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 588) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-19. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1848) with recommendation of adoption. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-19 10:30AM in conference room 211. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1207), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-01-19 1:20PM in conference room 224. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Re-Referred to AEN, WAM. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Referred to EET/AEN, WAM. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR20 (Carry Over) 2019-04-12 - The committees on TIA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Onishi, Holt, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Creagan, DeCoite, Perruso, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
HCR25 (Same As) 2019-05-02 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HCR25 (Same As) 2019-05-02 - Resolution adopted in final form.