HI SCR145 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Encouraging The Department Of Land And Natural Resources Division Of Forestry And Wildlife In The County Of Hawaii To Prioritize The Control Of High-threat Invasive Species.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Encouraging The Department Of Land And Natural Resources Division Of Forestry And Wildlife In The County Of Hawaii To Prioritize The Control Of High-threat Invasive Species.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-15HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Holt, Nakamura excused (4).
2019-04-15HouseReported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2274) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN.
2019-04-12HouseThe committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Onishi, Perruso, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Holt.
2019-04-09HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 04-12-19 9:30AM in conference room 312.
2019-04-05HouseReferred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 50
2019-04-04HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 628).
2019-04-04SenateReport and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
2019-04-03SenateOne Day Notice 04-04-19.
2019-04-03SenateReported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1789) with recommendation of adoption.
2019-03-27SenateThe committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Riviere.
2019-03-22SenateThe committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-19 1:20PM in conference room 229.
2019-03-13SenateReferred to WTL.
2019-03-08SenateOffered.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback