HI SB400 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB400

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the ALOHA homes authority to facilitate the development of low-cost homes for sale to Hawaii residents on state-owned and county-owned land near rail stations of the Honolulu rail transit system, to be known as the urban redevelopment district. Establishes guidelines within the urban redevelopment district. Establishes provisions related to the sale of leasehold interest of ALOHA homes. Exempts land owned by the authority from the definition of public lands in section 171-2, HRS. Exempts development by the authority from school impact fees. Establishes the ALOHA homes authority special fund. Authorizes the ALOHA homes authority to adopt rules pursuant to chapter 91, Hawaii Revised Statutes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Housing.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-01 Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
2019-01-31SenateThe committee on HOU deferred the measure.
2019-01-31SenateThe committee on WTL deferred the measure.
2019-01-31SenateRe-Referred to HOU/WTL, WAM/GVO.
2019-01-25SenateThe committee(s) on HOU/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-19 1:30PM in conference room 225.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to HOU/WTL, WAM.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB479 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
SB400 (Carry Over) 2019-01-31 - The committee on HOU deferred the measure.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback