HI SB3124 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-09 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 36
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Changes the income tax rates for taxable years beginning after 12/31/2020. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Taxation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-09HouseReferred to FIN, referral sheet 36
2020-03-05HousePass First Reading
2020-03-03HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 500) in amended form (SD 1).
2020-03-03SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2020-02-28Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20.
2020-02-28SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2020-02-28SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3015) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2020-02-19SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Kidani, Taniguchi.
2020-02-13SenateThe committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-19-20 11:00AM in conference room 211.
2020-02-11SenateThe committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-13-20 10:55AM in conference room 211.
2020-02-06SenateThe committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-20 10:30AM in conference room 211.
2020-01-27SenateReferred to WAM.
2020-01-27SenatePassed First Reading.
2020-01-23SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback