HI HCR43 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urging Hawaii's Congressional Delegation And The Governor To Collaborate With The Legislature To Ensure Expedited Burials For Veterans, Deceased Active Duty Members Of The United States Armed Forces, And Their Spouses At Veterans Cemeteries Throughout The State Of Hawaii.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urging Hawaii's Congressional Delegation And The Governor To Collaborate With The Legislature To Ensure Expedited Burials For Veterans, Deceased Active Duty Members Of The United States Armed Forces, And Their Spouses At Veterans Cemeteries Throughout The State Of Hawaii.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-22HouseResolution adopted in final form.
2019-04-22HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 924).
2019-04-22SenateReport and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
2019-04-18SenateOne Day Notice 04-22-19.
2019-04-18SenateReported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2190) with recommendation of adoption.
2019-04-16SenateThe committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto.
2019-04-12SenateThe committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-16-19 1:35PM in conference room 016.
2019-03-28SenateReferred to PSM.
2019-03-28SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 512).
2019-03-27HouseTransmitted to Senate.
2019-03-27HouseAdopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Holt, McKelvey excused (4).
2019-03-27HouseReported from PVM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1777), recommending adoption.
2019-03-20HouseThe committees on PVM recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Gates, D. Kobayashi, Kong, Nishimoto, Ohno, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2019-03-18HouseResolution scheduled to be heard by PVM on Wednesday, 03-20-19 11:00AM in conference room 430.
2019-03-14HouseReferred to PVM, referral sheet 33
2019-03-07HouseOffered
2019-03-06HouseTo be offered.

Same As/Similar To

HR43 (Same As) 2019-03-27 - Resolution adopted in final form.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback