HI HB533 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 2:22PM in conference room 224.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the Hawaii Broadband Office within HTDC. Establishes the position of State Broadband Strategy Officer. Renames the Broadband Assistance Advisory Council as the Broadband Advisory Council and amends its purpose and membership. Requires the CEO of HTDC to convene and chair the Broadband Advisory Council. Appropriates funds. Takes effect 7/1/3000. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Broadband.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-25SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 2:22PM in conference room 224.
2019-04-24HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-19 2:29PM in conference room 224.
2019-04-24SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-19 2:29PM in conference room 224.
2019-04-23SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-19 2:35PM in conference room 224.
2019-04-18HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 919).
2019-04-18SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: J.Keohokalole Chair; Wakai, Keith-Agaran Co-Chairs; Fevella.
2019-04-15SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808).
2019-04-15HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: McKelvey, Ohno, Kitagawa Co-Chairs; B. Kobayashi, Nakashima, Matsumoto.
2019-04-12SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804).
2019-04-11HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2019-04-09HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 752) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-04-09SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-05SenateOne Day Notice 04-09-19.
2019-04-05SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1977) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
2019-04-03SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele.
2019-04-01SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-19 10:25AM in conference room 211.
2019-03-22SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-03-22SenateReported from TEC/EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1514) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2019-03-20SenateThe committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Inouye, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Fevella.
2019-03-19SenateThe committee(s) on EET deferred the measure until 03-20-19 2:46PM in conference room 414.
2019-03-19SenateThe committee(s) on TEC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TEC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) J.Keohokalole, Moriwaki, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Fevella.
2019-03-14SenateThe committee(s) on TEC/EET has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-19 2:50PM in conference room 414.
2019-03-05SenateReferred to TEC/EET, WAM.
2019-03-01SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-01SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 56).
2019-02-28HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-02-28HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 837), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-20HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Gates, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Hashimoto, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, McDermott.
2019-02-15HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-20-19 4:00PM in House conference room 308.
2019-02-15HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
2019-02-15HouseReported from IAC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 509) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
2019-02-12HouseThe committees on IAC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, D. Kobayashi, Gates, Kong, Nishimoto, Takayama, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2019-02-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by IAC on Tuesday, 02-12-19 9:15AM in House conference room 430.
2019-02-08HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on IAC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Nakamura, Thielen excused (3).
2019-02-08HouseReported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 170) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to IAC.
2019-02-01HouseThe committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kitagawa, Eli, Johanson, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Quinlan.
2019-01-30HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-01-19 10:00AM in conference room 309.
2019-01-30HouseThe committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-01-19 10:00AM.
2019-01-25HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Wednesday, 01-30-19 10:00AM in House conference room 309.
2019-01-22HouseReferred to EDB, IAC, FIN, referral sheet 4
2019-01-22HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-18HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback