HI HB2682 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the agricultural technology transfer and workforce development program and provides for a coordinator position to provide support for secondary agricultural education and Future Farmers of America programs. Appropriates funds. Effective 1/1/2050. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Workforce Development.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-20 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Labor & Public Employment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16SenateThe hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
2020-03-13SenateThe committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-20 1:20PM in conference room 224.
2020-03-09SenateRe-Referred to AEN, WAM.
2020-03-03SenateReferred to AEN/LCA, WAM.
2020-03-03SenatePassed First Reading.
2020-03-03SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 270).
2020-02-28HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, DeCoite, Holt, Thielen excused (4). Transmitted to Senate.
2020-02-28HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 822-20), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2020-02-20HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2020-02-18HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-20-20 12:00PM in House conference room 308.
2020-02-12HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
2020-02-12HouseReported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 356-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2020-02-04HouseThe committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Ichiyama, Kitagawa, McKelvey, Quinlan, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2020-01-31HouseBill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 02-04-20 9:10AM in House conference room 309.
2020-01-30HouseRe-referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 9
2020-01-27HouseReferred to LAB/AGR, FIN, referral sheet 5
2020-01-23HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback