HI HB2590 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Enrolled on July 10 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-07-10 - Transmitted to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes within DOT an autonomous vehicles testing pilot program. Requires report to the legislature. (SD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Autonomous Vehicles.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-30 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-30 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-10HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2020-07-10SenateReceived notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 425).
2020-07-10HousePassed Final Reading as amended in SD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1).
2020-07-10HouseHouse agrees to Senate amendment(s).
2020-07-08SenateReceived notice of House intent to agree to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 421).
2020-07-06HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 607) in amended form (SD 2).
2020-07-06SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2020-07-02Senate48 Hrs. Notice 07-06-20.
2020-07-02SenateReported from CPH/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3734) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2020-06-30SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Moriwaki, Fevella.
2020-06-30SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Nishihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman, Wakai, Fevella.
2020-06-26SenateThe committee(s) on CPH/WAM will hold a public decision making on 06-30-20 10:00AM in conference room Auditorium.
2020-05-12SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH/WAM.
2020-05-12SenateReported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3454) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPH/WAM.
2020-03-11SenateThe committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, English.
2020-03-06SenateThe committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-11-20 1:15PM in conference room 225.
2020-03-03SenateReferred to TRS, CPH/WAM.
2020-03-03SenatePassed First Reading.
2020-03-03SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 254).
2020-02-28HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, DeCoite, Holt, Thielen excused (4). Transmitted to Senate.
2020-02-28HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 855-20), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2020-02-24HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
2020-02-21HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-24-20 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
2020-02-14HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa voting no (1) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2).
2020-02-14HouseReported from JUD/CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 665-20) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
2020-02-12HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Belatti, Cachola, Har, Kong, Mizuno, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa.
2020-02-12HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakashima, Perruso, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2020-02-10HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD/CPC on Wednesday, 02-12-20 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
2020-02-07HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD/CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Yamashita excused (2).
2020-02-07HouseReported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 191-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD/CPC.
2020-02-05HouseThe committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Hashimoto, Brower, Cullen, Hashem, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Woodson.
2020-02-03HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-05-20 10:15AM in conference room 423.
2020-01-31HouseThe committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-05-20.
2020-01-29HouseBill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Friday, 01-31-20 10:00AM in House conference room 423.
2020-01-27HouseReferred to TRN, JUD/CPC, FIN, referral sheet 5
2020-01-23HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback