HI HB1551 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a minimum-security housing program in a county with a population of more than 750,000 for short-term adult offenders. Provides capacity for a furlough program. Appropriates funds. (HB1551 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Public Safety.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12SenateThe committee on PSM deferred the measure.
2019-03-08SenateThe committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-19 1:15PM in conference room 229.
2019-03-05SenateReferred to PSM, WAM.
2019-03-01SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-01SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 132).
2019-02-28HousePassed Third Reading with Representative(s) Perruso voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-02-28HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 906), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-21HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Nakamura; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd.
2019-02-16HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-21-19 12:30PM in House conference room 308.
2019-02-15HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
2019-02-15HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 584), recommending referral to FIN.
2019-02-14HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, McKelvey, Morikawa, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Say.
2019-02-13HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-14-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-02-13HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-14-19.
2019-02-11HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 02-13-19 3:00PM in House conference room 325.
2019-02-06HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Thielen excused (2).
2019-02-06HouseReported from PVM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 74) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2019-02-01HouseThe committees on PVM recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Gates, D. Kobayashi, Kong, Nishimoto, Ohno, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2019-01-29HouseBill scheduled to be heard by PVM on Friday, 02-01-19 10:00AM in House conference room 430.
2019-01-28HouseReferred to PVM, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.

Same As/Similar To

SB1541 (Same As) 2019-02-01 - Re-Referred to PSM, WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback