HI HB144 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB144
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs and appropriates funds for UHERO to conduct an economic impact study regarding the impact of potential changes to coffee labeling laws on the local coffee industry. Establishes and appropriates funds for a coffee labeling task force. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Coffee Labeling.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | Senate | The committee on WAM deferred the measure. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | The committee on CPH deferred the measure. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH/WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-02-19 10:30AM in conference room 211. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH/WAM. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1415) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPH/WAM. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ruderman, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen, Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN deferred the measure until 03-20-19 1:16PM in conference room 224. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Re-Referred to AEN, CPH/WAM. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-19 1:30PM in conference room 224. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to AEN, CPH. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 340). |
2019-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) DeCoite, Har, Hashimoto, Holt, Kong, Matsumoto, McKelvey, Onishi, San Buenaventura, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Ward voting no (2) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1193) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-20 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Belatti, Cachola, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Har, Kong, Onishi; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Mizuno. |
2019-02-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-20-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2019-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) DeCoite, Har voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2). |
2019-02-14 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 417), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2019-01-30 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, Cachola, Perruso, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) DeCoite, Holt, Onishi; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa. |
2019-01-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 01-30-19 9:00AM in House conference room 312. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to AGR, CPC, referral sheet 2 |
2019-01-18 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB144 (Carry Over) 2019-04-02 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
SB888 (Same As) 2019-01-24 - Referred to AEN, CPH.
SB888 (Same As) 2019-01-24 - Referred to AEN, CPH.