HI HB1277 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-6)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-21 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides scholarships for the unmet direct cost needs of qualified students at any four-year University of Hawaii campus who meet certain eligibility criteria. Makes an appropriation for the Hawaii Promise Program. (HB1277 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The University Of Hawaii Promise Program.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
2019-03-21SenateReported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1350) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
2019-03-19SenateThe committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Fevella.
2019-03-15SenateThe committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-19 3:00PM in conference room 229.
2019-03-05SenateReferred to HRE, WAM.
2019-03-01SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-01SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 114).
2019-02-28HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-02-28HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 913), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-21HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd.
2019-02-16HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-21-19 12:30PM in House conference room 308.
2019-02-13HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Nakamura, Ward excused (4).
2019-02-12HouseDeferred one day 02-13-19.
2019-02-12HouseReported from LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 301) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2019-02-01HouseThe committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, Perruso, DeCoite, Johanson, D. Kobayashi, Ohno, Tarnas, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan, Tokioka.
2019-01-30HouseBill scheduled to be heard by LHE on Friday, 02-01-19 2:00PM in House conference room 309.
2019-01-28HouseReferred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-23HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback