HI HB1261 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Act 213, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1315).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Makes permanent the requirement that decisions in contested case hearings of the Commission on Water Resource Management, Land Use Commission, Public Utilities Commission, Hawaii Community Development Authority, and those involving conservation districts be appealed directly to the Supreme Court, with certain exceptions. Takes effect on June 30, 2019. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Related To Judicial Proceedings.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-09SenateAct 213, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1315).
2019-07-09HouseAct 213, on 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1315).
2019-04-24HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2019-04-25SenateReceived notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 859).
2019-04-24HousePassed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt excused (1).
2019-04-24HouseHouse agrees to Senate amendment(s).
2019-04-24SenateReceived notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 855).
2019-04-23HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 953).
2019-04-23SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: K. Rhoads Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; Fevella.
2019-04-23HouseReconsideration of action taken on 04-11-19.
2019-04-12SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804).
2019-04-11HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2019-04-09HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 841) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-04-09SenateReport Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, Ruderman, Shimabukuro. Noes, 2 (Senator(s) K. Kahele, Riviere). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-05SenateOne Day Notice 04-09-19.
2019-04-05SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2006) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
2019-04-03SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele.
2019-03-29SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-19 10:20AM in conference room 211.
2019-03-20SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-03-20SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1287) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2019-03-15SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Fevella.
2019-03-11SenateThe committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-19 9:00AM in conference room 016.
2019-03-07SenateReferred to JDC, WAM.
2019-03-07SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-07SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 458).
2019-03-05HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Quinlan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-02-28HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1).
2019-02-28HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 941) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-02-08HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, Morikawa, Takayama, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Thielen.
2019-02-07HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-08-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-02-07HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-08-19.
2019-02-05HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-07-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
2019-01-28HouseReferred to JUD, referral sheet 6
2019-01-24HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-23HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB416 (Same As) 2019-02-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback