GA SR986 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-27 - Senate Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-27 - Senate Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A RESOLUTION recognizing the growing incidence of chronic obstructive pulmonary disease in this state and encouraging the Georgia Department of Community Health to pass regulations requiring the collection of data relating to incidents of this disease in this state; and for other purposes.
Title
Chronic Obstructive Pulmonary Disease; recognize growing incidence
Sponsors
Sen. Gloria Butler [D] | Sen. Emanuel Jones [D] | Sen. Nan Orrock [D] | Sen. Valencia Seay [D] |
Sen. Donald Thomas [R] | Sen. Renee Unterman [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #809 - Consent Calendar Expressing The Will Of The Senate (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 11 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-27 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-03-11 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2010-03-10 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-02-08 | Senate Read and Referred |