GA SR981 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-22 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-22 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION creating the Joint Study Committee on Violence Against Health Care Workers; and for other purposes.
Title
Violence Against Health Care Workers; create joint study committee
Sponsors
Sen. Renee Unterman [R] | Sen. Chuck Hufstetler [R] | Sen. Steve Henson [D] | Sen. Francis Millar [R] |
Sen. Judson Hill [R] | Sen. Earl Carter [R] | Rep. Katie Dempsey [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #768 (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - House - House Vote #809 (Y: 171 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #542 (Y: 48 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - House - House Vote #809 (Y: 171 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #542 (Y: 48 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-22 | Effective Date | |
2014-04-22 | Act 601 | |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Agrees House Amend or Sub |
2014-03-18 | House | House Passed/Adopted As Amended |
2014-03-18 | House | House Third Readers |
2014-03-11 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-03-05 | House | House Second Readers |
2014-03-04 | House | House First Readers |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Senate Hopper |