GA SR899 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-09 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-09 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION recognizing March 9, 2018, as Unify Georgia Day at the state capitol; and for other purposes.
Title
Unify Georgia Day; recognize March 9, 2018
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-09 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/53160 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20172018/174504 |