GA SR841 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-22 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A RESOLUTION proposing an amendment to the Constitution so as to provide that the people of this state may petition the judiciary for declaratory relief from certain acts of this state or certain local governments or officers or employees thereof that violate the laws or Constitution of this state or the Constitution of the United States; to provide for related matters; to provide for the submission of this amendment for ratification or rejection; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Legislative Acts; void; people of this state may petition the judiciary for declaratory relief from certain acts of this state that violate the laws or Constitution of this state or the Constitution of the United States; provide -CA

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #600 (Y: 49 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #622 (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-22HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2020-06-17HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2020-06-15HouseHouse Second Readers
2020-03-13HouseHouse First Readers
2020-03-12SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2020-03-12SenateSenate Third Read
2020-03-12SenateSenate Taken from Table
2020-03-12SenateSenate Tabled
2020-03-04SenateSenate Read Second Time
2020-03-03SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2020-02-27SenateSenate Read and Referred
2020-02-26SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback