GA SR80 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-02 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-02 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION demanding revision by the College Board of Advanced Placement U.S. History; and for other purposes.
Title
College Board of Advanced Placement U.S. History; demand revision
Sponsors
Sen. William Ligon [R] | Sen. Francis Millar [R] | Sen. Judson Hill [R] | Sen. Rick Jeffares [R] |
Sen. Ben Watson [R] | Sen. Joshua McKoon [R] | Rep. Mike Dudgeon [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate Vote #109 (Y: 38 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-02 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2015-03-26 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-03-18 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-03-13 | House | House First Readers |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Senate Hopper |