GA SR793 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-19 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-19 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION creating the Joint Private Financing of Infrastructure Study Committee; and for other purposes.
Title
Joint Private Financing of Infrastructure Study Committee; create
Sponsors
Sen. Brandon Beach [R] | Sen. Steve Gooch [R] | Sen. Ben Watson [R] | Sen. John Albers [R] |
Sen. Ed Harbison [D] | Rep. Bruce Williamson [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Vote #584 (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-19 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-03-13 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-03-12 | House | House First Readers |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Senate Hopper |