GA SR774 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION honoring the life of Mr. Joseph Donald "J.D." Winston and dedicating an intersection in his memory; and for other purposes.
Title
J.D. Winston Memorial Intersection; Fulton County; dedicate
Sponsors
Sen. Nan Orrock [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-18 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Senate Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/68794 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20232024/226984 |