GA SR673 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-27 - House Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-27 - House Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A RESOLUTION making renewed application to the Congress of the United States to call for a convention for the purpose of proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the United States; and for other purposes.
Title
U.S. Congress; making renewed application to call for a convention; proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the United States
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Cowsert [R] | Sen. Greg Goggans [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Sen. Chip Rogers [R] |
Sen. Cecil Staton [R] | Sen. Tommie Williams [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #609 - Adoption (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #610 - Adoption (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #610 - Adoption (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-27 | House Postponed | |
2012-03-26 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-03-13 | House Second Readers | |
2012-03-12 | House First Readers | |
2012-03-07 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-07 | Senate Third Read | |
2012-02-24 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2012-02-23 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-01-23 | Senate Read and Referred |