GA SR629 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - Senate Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - Senate Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION recommending that certain measures be taken regarding the actions of the People's Republic of China against Falun Gong practitioners and other minority groups; and for other purposes.
Title
People's Republic of China; recommend certain measures be taken regarding actions against Falun Gong practitioners
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Sen. Kay Kirkpatrick [R] | Sen. Michael Rhett [D] | Sen. Harold Jones [D] |
Sen. John Albers [R] | Sen. John Wilkinson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Senate Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/52211 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20172018/171580 |