GA SR604 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-22 - House Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-22 - House Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION proposing an amendment to the Constitution so as to prohibit the levy of state ad valorem taxes; to provide for applicability; to provide for the submission of this amendment for ratification or rejection; and for other purposes.
Title
Revenue and Taxation; prohibit the levy of state ad valorem taxes -CA
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Heath [R] | Sen. Judson Hill [R] | Sen. Mike Crane [R] | Sen. Marty Harbin [R] |
Sen. Francis Millar [R] | Sen. John Albers [R] | Rep. Bruce Williamson [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #533 (Y: 39 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #539 (Y: 38 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #500 (Y: 38 N: 11 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #494 (Y: 35 N: 11 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #539 (Y: 38 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #500 (Y: 38 N: 11 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #494 (Y: 35 N: 11 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-22 | House | House Postponed |
2016-03-15 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-03-07 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-03-02 | House | House First Readers |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Senate Reconsidered |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate Notice to Reconsider |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate Third Read Lost |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Senate Hopper |