GA SR590 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-28 - Senate Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-28 - Senate Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A RESOLUTION urging the Georgia Department of Education to implement cardiopulmonary resuscitation (CPR) classes in the public schools of this state; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Dept. of Education; urged to implement cardiopulmonary resuscitation (CPR) classes in the public schools
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #538 - Adoption By Substitute (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-28 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-02-28 | Senate Third Read | |
2012-02-16 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2012-02-15 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-04-12 | Senate Read and Referred |