GA SR55 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-07 - Senate Notice to Reconsider
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-07 - Senate Notice to Reconsider
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A RESOLUTION proposing an amendment to the Constitution so as to provide that no law or rule or regulation shall compel any person, employer, or health care provider to participate in any health care system and to authorize persons and employers to pay directly for lawful health care services without penalties or fines; to provide a short title; to provide for the submission of this amendment for ratification or rejection; and for other purposes.
Title
Health Care Freedom of Choice -CA
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Butterworth [R] | Sen. Bill Heath [R] | Sen. Judson Hill [R] | Sen. Jack Murphy [R] |
Sen. Chip Rogers [R] | Sen. David Shafer [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #80 - Adoption Of Constitutional Amendment (Y: 35 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-07 | Senate Notice to Reconsider | |
2011-03-07 | Senate Third Read Lost | |
2011-03-07 | Senate Third Read | |
2011-02-15 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2011-02-10 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-02-02 | Senate Withdrawn & Recommitted | |
2011-01-27 | Senate Read and Referred |