GA SR510 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-20 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-20 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A RESOLUTION proposing an amendment to the Constitution so as to authorize the General Assembly to allow the State Properties Commission, the Board of Regents of the University System of Georgia, or both to enter into multiyear rental agreements without obligating present funds for the full obligation to the state under the full term of such agreements; to provide for procedures, conditions, and limitations; to provide for the submission of this amendment for ratification or rejection; and for other purposes.
Title
State Properties Commission; Board of Regents; multiyear rental agreements-CA
Sponsors
Sen. Chip Rogers [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-02-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #524 - Adoption Of Constitutional Amendment By Substitute (Y: 50 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-20 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-09 | House Second Readers | |
2010-03-08 | House First Readers | |
2010-02-18 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-02-18 | Senate Taken from Table | |
2010-02-17 | Senate Tabled | |
2010-02-17 | Senate Third Read | |
2010-02-11 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2010-02-10 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-09 | Senate Read and Referred |